MD HB1153 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a student who is enrolled at a public high school to satisfy a certain requirement to earn credits in mathematics by completing a credit in a certain college preparatory computer science or computer programming course selected by the county board; and requiring the county board to certify to the State Department of Education that the computer science or computer programming course may count toward the mathematics graduation requirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools – Mathematics Credit – College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (127-5)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {635764/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB892 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7209(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback