MD HB1153 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB823
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a student who is enrolled at a public high school to satisfy a certain requirement to earn credits in mathematics by completing a credit in a certain college preparatory computer science or computer programming course selected by the county board; and requiring the county board to certify to the State Department of Education that the computer science or computer programming course may count toward the mathematics graduation requirement.
Title
Public Schools – Mathematics Credit – College Preparatory Computer Science or Computer Programming Course
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-5) |
2020-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {635764/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1153 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB892 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB892 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Records
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology