MD HB1152 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a public school to notify a student's parent or legal guardian when there is a low balance in the student's meal account and before the student accrues unpaid meal debt; prohibiting a public school from communicating about unpaid meal debt directly with a student or in any way that embarrasses or humiliates the student; prohibiting a public school from taking certain actions in response to a student's unpaid meal debt; requiring certain notice about the application process and requirements for certain meal programs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-18HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7125(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback