MD HB1150 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to use a reverse auction, as provided for in certain provisions of law established by the Act, to select a pharmacy benefits manager or other entity to administer the State Rx Program; requiring the Department to procure a certain platform and associated services in a certain manner a certain period of time before the reverse auction is scheduled to be completed; requiring the Department to consult with certain other Departments in conducting a certain procurement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Maryland Competitive Pharmacy Benefits Manager Marketplace Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 434
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {816880/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance151601(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions2502.1(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions2502.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback