MD HB115 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain penalties for a person who displays a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license; and providing that a person who violates a certain section of the Act must appear in court and may not prepay the fine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 612
2021-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-19SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-18HouseThird Reading Passed (127-5)
2021-02-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {660419/1 Adopted
2021-02-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-06-12HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB20 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 613

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation16301(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation16303(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation16402(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback