MD HB1147 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a single-occupancy public restroom be marked with certain gender-inclusive signage in certain places of public accommodation and certain public buildings; authorizing certain places of public accommodation to use certain gender-inclusive signage that was in use before October 1, 2020; providing that a county or municipality is responsible for enforcing the signage requirement in place of public accommodation; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2020-02-11HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB401 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement2801(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement2803(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20301(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20307(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback