MD HB1147 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the jurisdiction of the equity court to include a petition for the emancipation of a minor; altering the conditions under which an individual who is 17 years old may marry; prohibiting an individual under the age of 17 years from marrying; repealing a certain exception to the prohibition against disclosure of an application for a marriage license by a clerk of the court; requiring a clerk of the court to review a certain order before issuing a marriage license under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-4) (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSpecial Order until 4/8 (Senator Ready) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-04-05SenateCommittee Amendment
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {748773/1
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (136-4)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {452415/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback