MD HB1145 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB69
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1468
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that it is unlawful for a parent or guardian of a student in a public school to fail to seek and participate in counseling with their child after receiving notice of violent and disruptive behavior; and requiring a public school principal to provide written notice to the parent or guardian of a student who engages in two or more number of incidents of violent and disruptive behavior in a public school during the school year.
Title
Education - Student Behavior - Parent Notice and Required Counseling (Parent Accountability Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-17 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1145 (Carry Over) 2022-03-09 - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
HB1468 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1468 (Carry Over) 2020-02-11 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Children
Counselors
Family Law
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
School Administration
Students
Violence
Counselors
Family Law
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
School Administration
Students
Violence
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-30.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 304.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1145?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb1145f.pdf |