MD HB1144 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing members of the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to make a certain designation in writing; repealing the requirement for the Commission to elect a chair; requiring that the Secretary of State Police serve as the chair of the Commission; requiring the Commission to conduct a certain job task analysis once every 10 years, beginning in 2020; specifying the duties of the Commission in regards to the training of police officers in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Procedures and Training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {452118/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety3201(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3202(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3203(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3204(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3207(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3209(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3209.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3210(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3211(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3212(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3213(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3214(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3215(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3216(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback