MD HB1144 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring county boards of education to take certain reasonable steps to provide equal access to public services for certain individuals with limited English proficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Boards of Education - Equal Access to Public Services for Individuals With Limited English Proficiency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-9) (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-35) (Y: 102 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-38) (Y: 103 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (102-35)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (36-9)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {654335/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (102-38)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {745161/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1144&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1144f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1144t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1144e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_564_hb1144e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_74516101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1144_65433501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb1144.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1144_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0680.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1144_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1061.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1219.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback