MD HB1144 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Public Service Commission to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; requiring that specified civil penalties be paid into the Fund; etc.
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Retail Choice Customer Education and Protection Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Education
Investments
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Unfair Trade Practices
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Budgets
Civil Actions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Education
Investments
Penalties and Sentences
Public Service Commission
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Unfair Trade Practices
Utilities
Utility Regulation