MD HB1143 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing collective bargaining rights to certain tenured or tenure-track faculty, adjunct faculty, and graduate student employees at certain public institutions of higher education; altering certain exceptions to the applicability of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for State employees; establishing separate collective bargaining units for certain tenured or tenure-track faculty, adjunct faculty, and graduate student employees; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Tenured Faculty, Adjunct Faculty, and Graduate Student Employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-14HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback