MD HB1143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing collective bargaining rights to certain tenured or tenure-track faculty, adjunct faculty, and graduate student employees at certain public institutions of higher education; altering certain exceptions to the applicability of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for State employees; establishing separate collective bargaining units for certain tenured or tenure-track faculty, adjunct faculty, and graduate student employees; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Tenured Faculty, Adjunct Faculty, and Graduate Student Employees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Collective Bargaining
Community Colleges
Education
Higher Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Community Colleges
Education
Higher Education
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
State Government - Personnel
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment