MD HB1142 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "passenger car" to include a certain Class E (truck) vehicle for the purposes of the application of certain provisions of law governing collision damage waivers for rental vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law142101(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13917(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback