MD HB1142 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "passenger car" to include a certain Class E (truck) vehicle for the purposes of the application of certain provisions of law governing collision damage waivers for rental vehicles.
Title
Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 433 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 917 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |