MD HB1141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to submit an annual report on the Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals on or before September 30 each year.
Title
Labor and Employment - Apprenticeship Career Training Pilot Program for Formerly Incarcerated Individuals - Report
Sponsors
Del. Keith Haynes [D] | Sen. Michael Jackson [D] | Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D] | Del. Pamela Queen [D] |
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 432 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Apprentices
Ex-Offenders
Grants
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Ex-Offenders
Grants
Labor, Department of
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |