MD HB1141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of certain provisions of law exempting agricultural buildings used for agritourism from a certain permit requirement to apply statewide.
Title
Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Bates) Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {370215/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |