MD HB1140 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Governor's Commission to Study Mental and Behavioral Health in Maryland jointly to take certain actions in order to develop and implement a comprehensive mobile response and stabilization system for children and families in the State; and requiring the Department and the Commission jointly to submit their findings and recommendations to certain committees in the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020.
Title
Health - Mobile Response and Stabilization System for Children and Families in Maryland - Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB624 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Services
Grants
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Prices
Public Health
Reports
Emergency Services
Grants
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Prices
Public Health
Reports
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1140?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1140f.pdf |