MD HB1137 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB95
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study School Bus Safety; requiring the Workgroup to identify issues related to safety for and behavior of students and bus drivers on buses driven to or from a primary or secondary school in the State; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the governing body of each county and Baltimore City, each county board of education, including Baltimore City, the Governor, and the General Assembly by June 30, 2024.
Title
Workgroup to Study School Bus Safety (Maryland School Bus Safety Act of 2023)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB1137 (Carry Over) 2023-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Governor
Primary Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
School Buses
Secondary Schools
studies
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Education - Miscellaneous
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Governor
Primary Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
School Buses
Secondary Schools
studies
Sunset
Transportation, Department of