MD HB1137 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education to study and make recommendations regarding any statutory or regulatory changes needed to the Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students; and requiring, by December 31, 2019, the Department to submit its recommendations to the Governor, the State Board of Education and the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home and Hospital Teaching Program for Students – Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {845668/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback