MD HB1137 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the tidal fish license and oyster authorization requirements for persons aboard a boat who are using diving apparatus to catch oysters for commercial purposes in the waters of the State; prohibiting more than two commercial oyster divers from working on a boat at a time; requiring each commercial oyster diver to have an attendant on the boat; establishing certain daily limits on the oyster catch; establishing that exceeding the oyster catch limits under certain circumstances is a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster Divers
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Del. Mark Fisher [R] | Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] |
Del. Robin Grammer [R] | Del. Bob Long [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] |
Del. Charles Otto [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senators Kagan, Young, and Waugh |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2018-04-06 | House | Delegates Stein, Jacobs, and Gilchrist |
2018-04-06 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2018-04-06 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2018-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864337/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {950310/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boats and Ships
Commerce and Business
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Oysters
Time
Weights and Measures
Commerce and Business
Equipment
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Oysters
Time
Weights and Measures