MD HB1136 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County, for the 2020-2021 licensing period, to reimburse holders of certain alcoholic beverages licenses the entire amount of the annual license fee under certain circumstances; and requiring the Board, for the 2020-2021 licensing period, to reimburse a certain percentage of the annual license fee for certain alcoholic beverages licenses under certain circumstances and to reimburse a certain amount of the annual license fees the next fiscal year under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2021-04-08HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {204832/1 Adopted
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {903499/1 Adopted
2021-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB944 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback