MD HB1135 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education, on behalf of certain sponsors, to submit to the U.S. Department of Agriculture certain waivers relating to the federal Summer Food Service Program; requiring the Department to prepare and submit certain waiver requests in accordance with certain guidelines; and requiring the Department to apply to renew certain waivers under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Education - Summer Food Service Program - Regulatory Waivers (Summer Meals Waiver Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-02-27HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB828 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7606(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback