MD HB1135 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adding bingo in Carroll County to the list of home games that an individual may conduct in a common area of a residential property if the property is restricted to residents who are at least 55 years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll County – Gaming – Home Games – Bingo

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 187
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {235862/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback