MD HB1135 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the County Executive and County Council of Prince George's County to recognize and categorize the Board of License Commissioners of Prince George's County as a public safety agency for budgetary purposes; authorizing the County Council to include in the budget a maximum of $50,000 to maintain software and mobile devices used to modernize practices and increase the efficiency and transparency of the Board; requiring the County Executive and County Council to establish a specified fund for specified purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 299
2016-04-11HouseReturned Passed
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2016-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-07SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2016-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {213994/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2016-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-11HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1135?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1135f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb1135t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_299_hb1135t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/hb1135_21399401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb1135.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1135_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb1135_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1135,h-0440&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1135,s-1238&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback