MD HB1135 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the number of gaming permits to six that the Board of County Commissioners of Kent County may issue in a single year to an organization that meets specified qualifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kent County - Gaming - Permits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-07SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2014-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2014-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2014-03-04HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback