MD HB1135 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the number of members of the State Board for Professional Engineers; and requiring one of the engineer members of the Board to be appointed, without regard for a specific professional practice, from a list submitted by the Maryland Society of Professional Engineers; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board for Professional Engineers - Increase in Membership and Practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-05 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2011-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-07 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-25 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-04-06 Returned Passed
2011-03-26 Third Reading Passed (136-0)
2011-03-25 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-25 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-26 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2011-02-14 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback