MD HB1135 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on specified grocery stores in specified areas; authorizing the county or municipal corporation to provide for the amount and duration of the credit, eligibility criteria for the credit, specified regulations and procedures, and any other provisions necessary to carry out the credit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax Credit - Grocery Stores - Low-Income Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-20 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-05 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2010-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-08 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2010-03-26 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-25 First Reading Budget and Taxation
2010-04-02 Returned Passed
2010-03-22 Third Reading Passed (138-0)
2010-03-21 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-21 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-22 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2010-02-17 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-17 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback