MD HB1134 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from engaging in certain sexual activity with an animal; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {272515/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-02-27HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback