MD HB1131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 430
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a boat or vessel used under a limited fishing guide license may be propelled by human power.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Limited Fishing Guide License - Propulsion of Boats and Vessels

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 430
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB793 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 431

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources4210(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback