MD HB1130 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on private property in Talbot County on a Sunday during the bow hunting season from the first Sunday in October through the second Sunday in January the following year, inclusive, subject to certain provisions of law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (122-11)
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-13HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB312 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources10410(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback