MD HB1130 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that certain residential treatment centers be subject to certain reporting requirements regarding inappropriate sexual behavior established by the Maryland Department of Health under certain regulations; and defining "inappropriate sexual behavior".
Title
Residential Treatment Centers - Mandatory Reporting of Inappropriate Sexual Behavior
Sponsors
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] | Del. Pat Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Group Homes
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Nursing Homes
Patients
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Nursing Homes
Patients
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses