MD HB1129 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt turkey on a Sunday in Talbot County through participation in a certain junior hunt; authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt deer on a Sunday in Talbot County with a firearm through participation in a certain junior deer hunt or during any Sunday during the deer firearms season in January; and applying the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Talbot County - Turkey and Deer Hunting - Sundays

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (119-14)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {450210/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-13HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB500 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources10405(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources10410(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback