MD HB1127 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain requirements for filing with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner certain rates and supplementary rate information and for modifications of rates and supplementary rate information do not apply to exempt commercial policyholders; repealing the requirement that a certain commercial policyholder has to certify in a certain manner to the Commissioner that it meets certain criteria for a certain exemption; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance – Commercial Lines – Exemptions From Filings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193
2018-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {533496/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback