MD HB1126 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to take final action on a certain application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity only after due consideration of the effect of a generating station, an overhead transmission line, or a qualified generator lead line on air quality and water pollution, rather than the effect of the generating station, overhead transmission line, or qualified generator lead line on air and water pollution when applicable; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Criteria to Consider

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {773620/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (19-25) (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-09SenateFloor Amendment {773620/1 (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (19-25)
2018-04-09SenateFloor Amendment {593128/1 (Senator Madaleno) Withdrawn
2018-04-06SenateSpecial Order until 4/9 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFloor Amendment {593128/1 (Senator Madaleno)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {483094/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1126&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1126f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1126t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1126_48309401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1126_59312801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb1126_77362001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb1126.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1126_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0607.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1126_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1305.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1306.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback