MD HB1125 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Locally Operated Transit System Grant Program in the Department of Transportation; and authorizing program funds to be sourced from federal and State public transportation programs.
Title
Transit - Grant Funding for Local Service - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Jared Solomon [D] | Sen. Nick Charles [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Kevin Harris [D] |
Del. Jeffrie Long [D] | Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 508 |
2023-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-13) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {363921/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB939 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-17 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Buses
Consumer Price Index
Counties
Federal Aid
Governor
Grants
Mass Transit
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Budgets
Buses
Consumer Price Index
Counties
Federal Aid
Governor
Grants
Mass Transit
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 4 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |