MD HB1124 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-7)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Budget and Management to provide certain units with training on the preparation of certain economic analyses; requiring a certain promulgating unit to establish an electronic registry and to post on the registry a proposed regulation or the scope of a proposed regulation; requiring certain notification when a proposed regulation or the scope of a proposed regulation is posted; repealing provisions of law relating to the Advisory Council on the Impact of Regulations on Small Businesses; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government – Regulations Impacting Small Businesses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 212
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {344838/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {806182/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1124&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1124f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1124t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1124e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_212_hb1124e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1124_80618201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb1124_34483801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb1124.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1124_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1124_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0679.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1124_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1420.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1210.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback