MD HB1122 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Excluding public institutions of higher education from certain provisions of law governing protection of information by government agencies; requiring public institutions of higher education to review and designate certain systems as systems of record based on certain criteria and to develop and adopt a certain privacy governance program to govern each system of record; requiring public institutions of higher education to develop and adopt a certain information security and risk management program for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government – Protection of Personally Identifiable Information – Public Institutions of Higher Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 429
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {886489/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2020-02-10HouseReassigned to Health and Government Operations Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB588 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government101301(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government10-13A01(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government10-13A2(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government10-13A3(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government10-13A4(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback