MD HB1121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services and the Department of Human Services to convene a workgroup with a public policy institute in the State to increase accountability for prevention and intervention services delivered to children by the Department of Juvenile Services through evidence-based, research-based, and culturally competent practices; requiring the workgroup to complete a baseline assessment and publish a certain inventory; requiring the workgroup to consider and identify certain factors; etc.
Title
Juvenile Services - Workgroup to Develop Evidence-Based, Research-Based, and Culturally Competent Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-6) |
2021-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {573623/1 (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Crutchfield) Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB905 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Evidence
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Evidence
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset