MD HB1120 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the Secretary of Health or certain units of the Maryland Department of Health have exclusive jurisdiction to enforce certain laws by certain action; establishing that the Commission on Civil Rights and the Secretary or certain units have concurrent jurisdiction over certain discrimination; authorizing the Commission to take certain action when the Secretary or certain units have exclusive jurisdiction; requiring the Secretary or certain units to notify the Commission of certain hearings; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Providers – Discrimination in Provision of Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 428
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {476180/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB738 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General19355(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General21001(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General21002(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General21003(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General21004(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback