MD HB1120 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing retirees who participate in a certain prescription drug benefit plan to elect to have a spouse or dependent child covered under a certain State plan; requiring the Department of Budget and Management, on or before January 1, 2020, to establish the Maryland State Retiree Prescription Drug Coverage Program that reimburses participants for out-of-pocket costs that exceed certain limits; requiring the Department to establish a Maryland State Retiree Life-Sustaining Prescription Drug Assistance Program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retiree Benefits - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-9) (Y: 121 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {759335/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-03-26SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (120-9)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {824568/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-22HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate B. Barnes) Adopted
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments {824568/1
2019-03-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback