MD HB1118 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to design a voluntary developmental disability self-disclosure card to provide details of an individual's developmental disabilities and include written guidance on effective communication between law enforcement officers and people with developmental disabilities; requiring the Administration to make the card available by January 1, 2021 to any individual of driving age who requests one; requiring the Administration to provide the card to the parents of a minor who requests a card; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicle Administration – Voluntary Developmental Disability Self–Disclosure Cards – Design and Issuance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 427
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {220516/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB885 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation16118.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback