MD HB1117 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a pedestrian from catching or attempting to catch fish by any means on or under the Maryland Route 18 Kent Island Drawbridge over the Kent Narrows in Queen Anne's County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {180214/1 Adopted
2021-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation21507(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback