MD HB1117 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the property tax credit in Harford County for specified residential real property in proximity to specified refuse disposal systems to additional residential real property.
Title
Harford County Property Tax Credit - Homes near a Refuse Disposal System -
Sponsors
Sen. Mary James [D] | Del. Daniel Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-06 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2010-04-04 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (141-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading Ways and Means |