MD HB1115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workforce Readiness Grant Program to provide matching grants to a community college to improve the community college's technology; authorizing each community college to accept certain donations that further the purpose of the Program; authorizing the Governor, in fiscal years 2022 and 2024, to appropriate for each community college supplemental funding equal to the lesser of $250,000 for each campus of each community college or the amount of certain donations in certain fiscal years; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Colleges - Workforce Readiness Grant Program - Established

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-05SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-04-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {804264/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback