MD HB1113 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Procurement Improvement Council to provide a forum to discuss the use of eMaryland Marketplace and compliance with certain provisions of law; and requiring the Council to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021, on guidelines on the publication of certain notices and awards on eMaryland Marketplace and recommendations on strategies and enforcement mechanisms to improve certain compliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Finance and Procurement – Procurement Improvement Council – Form for Discussion and Report on the Required Use of eMaryland Marketplace

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {526089/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-12HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement12105(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement17502(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback