MD HB1112 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Entering into the Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact; requiring a state to meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; requiring certain audiologists and speech-language pathologists to meet certain eligibility requirements to exercise the privilege to practice; requiring member states to recognize the right of an audiologist or a speech-language pathologist to practice via telehealth under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-12HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB416 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations23A-01(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback