MD HB1112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing all counties and municipal corporations to release liens for unpaid real property taxes or other charges and assessments to facilitate a transfer of real property if certain conditions are satisfied; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to withhold certain real property from tax sale under certain circumstances; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to sell certain abandoned property at tax sale for less than the total amount of certain taxes, interest and penalties, and expenses; etc.
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsors
Del. Marvin Holmes [D] | Del. Bob Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Floor Amendment {133225/1 (Delegate Ali) Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate Walker) Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {525165/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Baltimore City
Counties
Judgments
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Baltimore City
Counties
Judgments
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Real Property
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property