MD HB1111 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the authorization for the Secretary of State Police to require certain training; requiring a certain candidate for a commission as a special police officer to complete at least 80 hours of instruction; exempting a certain candidate for commission as a special police officer from completing certain instruction under certain circumstances; and requiring an applicant for the renewal of a commission as a special police officer to receive certain training before applying for renewal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Special Police Officers - Training and Renewal of Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 426
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {762815/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety3303(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3312(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback