MD HB1110 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, by June 1, 2019, to develop health and safety best practices for the use of digital devices in school classrooms; and requiring the Department, by July 1, 2019, to provide the best practices to each county board and nonpublic school for consideration and adoption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools – Health and Safety Best Practices – Digital Devices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-02SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-29SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {855867/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback